Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Mathias, Montgomery, Currie, Manno, McFadden, and Peters
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified definition for fiscal years 2017 and 2018 to determine the number of students used to calculate the State compensatory education grant for schools that participate in the federal community eligibility provision for school meals; requiring the State Department of Education, the Department of Budget and Management, and the Department of Legislative Services to submit a specified report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0965
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {499235/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {135267/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, and Eckardt
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Delegates M. Washington, Hornberger, and Ebersole
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {499235/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 38
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {135267/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 60
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, and Eckardt 58
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 House Refuses to Recede 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Delegates M. Washington, Hornberger, and Ebersole 62
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM