Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Reports on Nonquantitative Treatment Limitations and Data
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine and Hester
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 212
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain carriers, on or before March 1, 2022 and March 1, 2024 to submit a report to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to demonstrate the carrier's compliance with the federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act; requiring certain carriers to identify five health benefit plans with the highest enrollment for each product offered in certain markets and conduct a certain analysis; authorizing certain carriers to submit a request to the Commissioner that disclosure of certain information be denied; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0455
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {467074/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 212
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits - Treatment Criteria
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {467074/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Reports on Nonquantitative Treatment Limitations and Data
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49A
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 212
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance – Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Reports on Nonquantitative Treatment Limitations and Data
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-144 )
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:59 PM