Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Astle, Feldman, Klausmeier, Middleton, and Robey
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Health Services Cost Review Commission, consistent with Maryland's all-payer model contract, to establish hospital rate levels and rate increases in a specified manner and promote and approve specified alternative methods of rate determination and payment; increasing the total amount of user fees that the Commission may assess on specified facilities; altering the contents of a specified annual report the Commission is required to submit to specified individuals and the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0298
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed 23
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 28
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-207, 19-212, 19-213, 19-214, 19-217, 19-219 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM