Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Oaks, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop, on or before December 1, 2017, with the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation and the Governor's Workforce Development Board statewide goals that reach 45% for the percentages of high school students who complete specified requirements; requiring specified entities to develop specified earnings goals; requiring the Division of Workforce Development to create specified apprenticeship programs; allowing a specified tax credit for employing a specified apprentice; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0652
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017, July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787170/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {787170/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-204 )
(   11-102, 11-103 )
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM