Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a nongovernmental corporate party to file, at a first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, two copies of a certain disclosure statement; specifying the contents of the disclosure statement; requiring a nongovernmental corporate party to file a supplemental statement if any required information changes; requiring the Act to be interpreted in a manner that is consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/16/2020
Legislative Date
10/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 10/16/2020 10/16/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 12:04 PM
Click to return on the top page