Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Designation of Lay Caregivers
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Middleton, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a hospital to provide a patient or the legal guardian of a patient with an opportunity to designate a lay caregiver before the patient is discharged from the hospital; requiring a hospital to document the decision to not designate a lay caregiver by a patient or the legal guardian of a patient in the patient's medical record; authorizing the patient or the legal guardian of the patient to change the designation of a lay caregiver in the event the lay caregiver becomes incapacitated; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1277
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997370/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments {997370/1 Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 29
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 31
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-301, 19-380 through 19-385 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM