Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators King, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Peters, Raskin, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of specified funding for each participating regional resource center, the State Library Resource Center, and each county public library system for specified fiscal years.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0144
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (134-1)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-35)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 38
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 72
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 72
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (134-1) 72
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (103-35) 72
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-205, 23-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM