Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving - Excessive Speeding
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a person who drives 20 miles per hour or more above the maximum speed limit is guilty of reckless driving; and establishing that a person charged with reckless driving must appear in court and may not prepay the fine.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0494
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/03/2020
Legislative Date
10/03/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving - Excessive Speeding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 10/03/2020 10/03/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving - Excessive Speeding
Last Updated: 1/26/2021 6:07 PM
Click to return on the top page