Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators King, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Kagan, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, Nathan-Pulliam, Raskin, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the required funding amount for community colleges including the Baltimore City Community College in specified fiscal years.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0361
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-305, 16-512 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM