Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Commerce - Sister-State Relationships - Maintenance and Development
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring lead responsibility for maintenance and development of the sister-state relationships from the Secretary of State to the Office of International Trade in the Department of Commerce.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Department of Commerce - Sister-State Relationships - Maintenance and Development
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page