Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Augustine, Feldman, King, Peters, West, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing certain requirements technology-based businesses must meet before the Maryland Technology Development Corporation may make a certain grant or provide certain equity investment financing; requiring the Corporation to adopt certain regulations related to the investment committee; requiring the Board of Directors of the Corporation to make certain appointments; providing that certain persons are subject to the Public Ethics Law; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0543
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707076/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {765367/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {707076/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {765367/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Text - Chapter - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations
(   10-401, 10-402, 10-403, 10-407, 10-408, 10-409, 10-415, 10-468, 10-469, 10-470, 10-474, 10-475, 10-478, 10-488, 10-489, 10-494 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page