Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating in Calvert County a refillable container permit; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for the counties to issue the permit to a holder of specified classes of alcoholic beverages licenses issued by the Board; specifying that a holder of a permit may sell draft beer for consumption off the licensed premises in a refillable container which meets specified requirements; requiring an applicant for the permit to complete a specified form and pay a specified fee; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604631/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873992/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2014 1/21/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {604631/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {873992/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 67
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (39-0) 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM