Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wireless Landline Telephone Service - Prohibition and Study
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified telephone companies from replacing landline or wireline telephone service to a customer with specified wireless telephone service; prohibiting the Public Service Commission from authorizing specified telephone companies to replace landline or wireline telephone service to a customer with wireless telephone service; and requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before a specified date.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0447
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM