Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey and Miller
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $46,881,848 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public buildings, roads, and facilities in Calvert County, as herein defined, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0783
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 24
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 24
Text - Third - Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Referred Appropriations 27
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 1:00 PM