Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Astle, Guzzone, Kagan, and Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the name of the Insect Sting Emergency Treatment Program to be the Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program; establishing the program as a means of authorizing specified individuals to administer life-saving treatment to individuals who have severe adverse reactions to allergens or insect stings when physician or emergency medical services are not immediately available in a youth camp; authorizing specified certificate holders and agents to administer auto-injectable epinephrine to an individual under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0658
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937374/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {996580/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {937374/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 48
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments {996580/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-701 through 13-704, 13-705, 13-705 through 13-707, 13-706, 13-708, 13-709 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM