Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - University System of Maryland)
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Approving certain projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of certain academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; approving the issuance of bonds by the University System of Maryland in a total principal amount of $20,000,000 for financing the projects; providing that the bonds issued under the authority of the Act are not a debt or obligation of the State or any of its subdivisions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (129-2)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 50
Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Appropriations 51
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (129-2) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:21 AM