Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Licensure
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, and Forehand
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an individual, except under specified circumstances, to be licensed by the Board before practicing psychology as a psychology associate in the State; specifying the circumstances under which a licensed psychology associate is authorized to practice psychology in the State; requiring an individual to meet specified requirements to qualify for licensure as a psychology associate; requiring an applicant for licensure as a psychology associate, except under specified circumstances, to pass specified examinations; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0274
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101, 18-202, 18-206, 18-301, 18-302, 18-306, 18-308 through 18-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM