Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Refunds - Wynne Case - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, on or before December 31, 2017, specified individuals eligible for an income tax refund as a result of a specified United States Supreme Court decision to file an amended income tax return for specified taxable years to claim an income tax refund; providing for the determination of eligibility for a specified income tax refund; prohibiting an individual that claims a specified income tax refund from receiving interest on the income tax refund; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Refunds - Wynne Case - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Refunds - Wynne Case - Eligibility
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM