Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Use of Text Messaging Device or Handheld Telephone While Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death or Serious Injury - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from committing a violation of a prohibition against using a text messaging device or a handheld telephone while driving that causes an accident that directly results in the death or serious bodily injury of another; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1212
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108976/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Getty) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108976/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {423227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {632018/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (117-20)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senators Raskin, Shank, and Muse
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Delegates Anderson, Clippinger, and Cluster
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-23)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {108976/1 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Laid Over (Senator Getty) Adopted 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {108976/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {423227/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {632018/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (117-20) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Requests House Recede 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senators Raskin, Shank, and Muse 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 House Refuses to Recede 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Delegates Anderson, Clippinger, and Cluster 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (110-23) 70
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-402, 21-1124.1, 21-1124.2, 21-1124.3, 27-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM