Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in business as a liquid waste hauler in the State unless the vehicle used by the person to haul liquid waste is licensed annually by the Department of the Environment; establishing specified requirements for the application for and the issuance of a specified vehicle license; requiring the Department to set reasonable fees for the licensing and inspection of specified vehicles in a specified manner; requiring the Department to adopt specified regulations; providing for criminal penalties; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0189
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-11A-01 through 9-11A-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM