Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veterans
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson, Benson, Hough, Simonaire, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding eligibility for a property tax exemption for the dwelling house of a disabled veteran to include veterans with a service connected disability of at least 80%; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0708
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0357 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veterans
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veterans
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veterans
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 50
Text - Third - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veterans
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Ways and Means 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 10:02 PM