Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Universal Voter Registration Act
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Ramirez, Raskin, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, King, Lee, Madaleno, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration and specified social service agencies to provide electronic records to the State Board of Elections regarding individuals who hold a driver's license or identification card, are at least 16 years of age, are citizens of the United States, and receive assistance from a social services agency; requiring the State Board to determine whether each individual whose electronic record it receives is eligible to be registered to vote and to provide specified information to local boards of elections; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424334/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424334/1
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (21-24)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Failed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {424334/1 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {424334/1 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (21-24) 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Failed 61A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102, 3-201, 3-202, 3-203, 3-204, 3-301, 3-302, 3-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM