Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Tasting License
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing in Somerset County a beer and wine tasting (BWT) alcoholic beverages license for a holder of a beer, wine and liquor license or a beer and wine license, notwithstanding any other provision of law; specifying that a BWT license authorizes a holder to serve specified alcoholic beverages for tasting purposes only and for no consideration; requiring the County Board of License Commissioners to regulate the quantity and number of bottles of specified alcoholic beverages to be served; specifying license and issuance fees; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 28
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 28
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 33
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM