Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Protection of Information – Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Information Technology)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain units of State government to employ certain reasonable security procedures and practices; requiring certain units of State government to undertake activities comprising collection, processing, and sharing of personally identifiable information in good faith; requiring each public institution of higher education to submit a report including a summary of the status of any data privacy framework and the number and disposition of reported breaches, if any, to the Governor on or before December 1 each year; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Government – Protection of Information – Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 12:41 PM
Click to return on the top page