Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County to issue a Class BLX license for a movie theater under certain circumstances; prohibiting the issuance of a Class BLX license to a movie theater in the 26th legislative district; authorizing the holder of the license to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption; allowing the holder of the license to serve only customers who have proof of admission to the movie theater; providing the hours of sale for the license; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0185
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0206 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424733/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {123095/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {733724/1 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {424733/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Economic Matters 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {123095/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate Walker) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Floor Amendment {733724/1 (Delegate Walker) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters
(   26-102, 26-1606, 26-1616, 26-2004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page