Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Veterans Affairs)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a person who charges a fee for certain veterans benefits services or veterans benefits appeals services to provide a written disclosure statement to and obtain written acknowledgment of the disclosure statement from certain individuals under certain circumstances; requiring a certain person who charges a fee for providing certain veterans benefits appeals services to include a certain notice in advertisements for those services; establishing a civil penalty of up to $1,000 for each violation; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 12:25 PM
Click to return on the top page