Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Raskin, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Ready, Rosapepe, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, Zirkin, Edwards, Eckardt, and Zucker
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring the College Savings Plans of Maryland Board to establish the Maryland ABLE Program to help promote financial savings to support individuals with disabilities in maintaining health, independence, and quality of life; renaming the College Savings Plans of Maryland Board to be the Maryland 529 Board; requiring the Board to work in consultation with the Department of Disabilities regarding the Maryland ABLE Program; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0431
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {279435/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {279435/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1901, 18-1902.1, 18-1904, 18-1905, 18-19A-05, 18-19B-05, 18-19C-01 through 18-19C-10 )
(   10-205, 10-207, 10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM