Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Statute of Limitations and Notice Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that when a specified cause of action accrues in favor of a minor or mental incompetent under the Local Government Tort Claims Act or the Maryland Tort Claims Act, an action must be filed within 3 years after the disability is removed; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0147 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {728674/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {728674/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {163320/1 Rejected
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {282710/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-38)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senators Ramirez, Muse, and Norman
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
71
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {728674/1 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {728674/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {163320/1 Rejected 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {282710/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-38) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senators Ramirez, Muse, and Norman 66
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 House Refuses to Recede 71
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM