Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study the Optional Retirement Program
Sponsored by
Senators Serafini, Cassilly, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Ready, Salling, and Simonaire
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study the Optional Retirement Program; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; prohibiting a member of the Workgroup from receiving specified compensation; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations on specified matters and to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0453 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup to Study the Optional Retirement Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Workgroup to Study the Optional Retirement Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Workgroup to Study the Optional Retirement Program
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 19
Text - Third - Workgroup to Study the Optional Retirement Program
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Appropriations 25
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM