Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Maternal Mortality Review Program – Recommendations and Reporting Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Carter, Eckardt, Elfreth, Ellis, Ferguson, Hayes, Kagan, Kelley, Klausmeier, Lam, Lee, McCray, Patterson, Smith, Washington, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maternal Mortality Review Program, in consultation with the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities, to make recommendations to reduce disparities in the maternal mortality rate, including recommendations related to social determinants of health; requiring the Secretary of Health to include in the annual report regarding the Maternal Mortality Review Program a section on racial disparities that compares certain mortality rates and other demographic measures; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0583
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Reporting Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Reporting Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {236880/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Reporting Requirement
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Reporting Requirement
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 34
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {236880/1 Adopted 53A
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 54
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health – Maternal Mortality Review Program – Recommendations and Reporting Requirement
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Text - Chapter - Health – Maternal Mortality Review Program – Recommendations and Reporting Requirement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1204, 13-1207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM