Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsored by
Senators Serafini, Edwards, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, the performance or inducement or attempted performance or inducement of an abortion unless a certain determination as to the probable age of the unborn child is made by a certain physician; providing that the failure of a physician to perform certain actions is deemed "unprofessional conduct"; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain regulations on or before January 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0907 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   20-217 through 20-225 )
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 2:42 PM