Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Child Abuse Registry
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring individuals convicted of child abuse to register with a certain supervising authority by a certain time and to register annually with a local law enforcement unit for a certain term; requiring a certain registration to include a digital image of the registrant that shall be updated at least once each year; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish a State child abuse registry and to provide certain information on the Internet; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1012
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0370 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - State Child Abuse Registry
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - State Child Abuse Registry
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-7A-01 through 11-7A-11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM