Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Corroboration of Testimony
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin and Norman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision prohibiting a court from entering a decree of divorce on the uncorroborated testimony of the party seeking the divorce; repealing a provision specifying that, in a suit for absolute divorce on the grounds of voluntary separation, a separation agreement is full corroboration of the plaintiff's testimony that the separation was voluntary under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {458973/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {382716/3 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-33)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {458973/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary 42
House 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {382716/3 Report Adopted 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58A
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-33) 59
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 8-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM