Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation, in conjunction with the Department of the Environment, to develop a plan to replace trees removed during construction of the Purple Line; requiring the Department of Transportation to consult with businesses, community representatives, local governments, and residents about the plan; requiring the plan to provide for the replacement of trees in areas affected by Purple Line construction with priority given to those with environmental justice issues or the heat island effect; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0080
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {747770/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Transportation and Department of the Environment – Purple Line Tree Replacement Plan
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {747770/1 Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page