Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (The Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the State Board of Education adopt and publish standards for the administration of a subsidized feeding program; requiring the State to be responsible for the student share of the costs of specified meals; prohibiting a county board from charging students eligible for a reduced price breakfast or lunch for any portion of the cost of a meal; altering the calculation for the reimbursement for specified meals to specified county boards of education; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0288
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0755 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (The Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 38
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed 39
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (The Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 41
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Ways and Means 43
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-601 through 7-605, 7-701 through 7-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM