Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Carroll County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $32,700,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in Carroll County, including water and sewer projects, to finance loans for fire or emergency-related equipment, buildings, and other facilities of volunteer fire departments in the County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0609
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 25
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 28
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM