Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Colburn, Ferguson, Kittleman, Montgomery, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to obtain specified census data, adjust the census data for specified purposes, and provide the census data to a temporary redistricting commission within a specified time period; creating a temporary redistricting commission; requiring the commission to use specified census data to prepare and adopt a districting plan for congressional districting within a specified time period; specifying that a specified districting plan is the plan for the State; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0832
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/25/2013 Text - First - Congressional Districting Process
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-6A-01 through 8-6A-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM