Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipeline Inspection Requirements - Best Available Technology
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a gas transmission company operating within the State to comply with all applicable federal laws and regulations with respect to gas pipeline safety inspections; authorizing the Public Service Commission to adopt regulations specifying the technology to be used for the inspection of specified gas pipelines located within the State; providing for the jurisdiction and enforcement authority of the Commission; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-103, 15-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM