Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility – Court–Ordered Evaluation
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Bates, Kelley, and Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court after a certain finding of incompetency or not criminally responsible due to a mental disorder to order the Maryland Department of Health as soon as possible after the defendant's admission, but not later than 48 hours, to evaluate a defendant, to develop a treatment plan, and to make a determination as to whether the defendant is a danger to self or others under certain circumstances; requiring a panel to convene within 9 days after a certain individual's refusal of medication for certain purposes: etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0202
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0691 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {358472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Court-Ordered Medication
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {358472/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility – Court–Ordered Evaluation
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Referred Judiciary 45
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Text - Chapter -
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-106, 3-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM