Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation Tax
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to impose a sales and use tax on motor fuel for the purpose of financing local road and transit capital projects; defining the county or municipal corporation sales and use tax on motor fuel authorized by the Act as a "local transportation tax"; providing that the local transportation tax rate may not exceed 2%; providing that State laws and regulations applicable to the State sales and use tax apply to a local transportation tax; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-102, 11-102.1, 11-104, 11-221, 2-1302.2 )
(   2-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM