Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipeline Inspection Requirements - State Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a gas transmission company operating within the State to comply with all applicable federal laws and regulations with respect to gas pipeline safety inspections; authorizing the Public Service Commission, subject to specified provisions of law, to impose a civil penalty of $100,000 per day on a gas transmission company that fails to have a gas pipeline inspected as required by federal law; requiring all penalties collected under the Act to be paid into the General Fund of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-103, 15-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM