Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Fee Exemptions - Disabled Veterans
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Bates, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, King, Norman, Robinson, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Brochin, Cassilly, Kelley, Lee, Muse, Ramirez, Smith, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 704
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting vehicles leased to and personally used by certain disabled veterans from vehicle registration fees.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Registration Fee Exemptions - Disabled Veterans
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {368272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Registration Fee Exemptions - Disabled Veterans
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 704
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Registration Fee Exemptions - Disabled Veterans
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Registration Fee Exemptions - Disabled Veterans
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {368272/1 Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Registration Fee Exemptions - Disabled Veterans
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 30
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 704
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Registration Fee Exemptions - Disabled Veterans
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM