Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Timing of Canvass
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time that a local board of elections may begin opening absentee ballot envelopes to canvass the absentee ballots cast in an election to before 9 a.m. on the Friday following election day instead of prior to 8 a.m. on the Wednesday following election day.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0555
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Timing of Canvass
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Timing of Canvass
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Timing of Canvass
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Timing of Canvass
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Referred Ways and Means 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
(   11-302 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page