Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground Rents
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Senators Conway, Ferguson, McFadden, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the scope of a specified procedure in law that authorizes Baltimore City to apply to a specified State agency in order to extinguish or redeem a ground rent on property acquired by Baltimore City under specified circumstances; altering the contents of a specified affidavit required in the procedure to extinguish or redeem a ground rent on property acquired by Baltimore City under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0521
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378278/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {378278/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 52
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM