Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Gladden, Kagan, Madaleno, McFadden, Miller, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing parole eligibility for a person sentenced for an offense committed before the person's 18th birthday under specified circumstances; authorizing a specified parole hearing date no later than every 3 years for an inmate not granted parole after becoming eligible; authorizing representation of counsel for a specified person under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0337
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-301, 7-305, 7-310 )
(   6-234, 8-102, 8-105 )
(   14-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM