Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "public school employee" for the purposes of provisions of law governing collective bargaining for certificated employees in Carroll County to include Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps (JROTC) instructors.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0570
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 32
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Ways and Means 33
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 12:44 PM