Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Act
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Benson, Guzzone, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Pinsky, Ramirez, Raskin, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program; requiring the Maryland Environmental Service to develop, implement, and administer the Program; requiring that every redeemable beverage container sold in the State indicate a 5-cent refund value in a specified manner on and after July 1, 2017; requiring that a specified refund value be added to the retail price of a specified container at the time of purchase on and after a specified date; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0862
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1733 through 9-1742 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM