Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Membership and Termination Date
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Frosh, Jones-Rodwell, Manno, Middleton, Montgomery, and Muse
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence; requiring the Commission to submit a specified report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1 of each year; and repealing the termination date of the Commission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753199/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6)
Proceedings
61
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 17
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Second Reading Passed 17
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 18
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 21
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {753199/1 Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6) 61
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM