Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Public Works Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, Lee, Peters, Raskin, Rosapepe, Young, and McFadden
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to provide specified notice at least 3 business days before the Board of Public Works may approve a reduction of appropriations; requiring the Secretary to publish on the Department's Web site, in a machine-readable format, notice of the proposed reduction including specified items and to provide written notice that includes the specified items to the Legislative Policy Committee, the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, and the House Appropriations Committee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0368
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {439136/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {439136/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Appropriations 43
House 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 55A
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 55A
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 56
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 4/07/2016 4/06/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM