Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver's License Suspensions - Failure to Satisfy Judgment - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Sponsored by
Senators Carter, Sydnor, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the assessment of points and penalties associated with driving a motor vehicle while the person's driver's license or privilege to drive is suspended for failure to satisfy a certain judgment.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Driver's License Suspensions - Failure to Satisfy Judgment - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 2:45 PM